AK HCR27 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 152, establishing September 11 of each year as Patriot Day.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 152
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 27 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2018-04-16 | House | VERSION: HCR 27 |
2018-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-16 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-16 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-03-29 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-03-29 | House | RLS |
2018-03-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |