AK HCR25 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 57
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 110, relating to the preservation of evidence and to the DNA identification system.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 110
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 57 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HCR 25 | |
2010-04-16 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-16 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: HCR 25 | |
2010-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | RLS FOR CALENDARING | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Legislators
Municipalities
Public Defender
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Uniform Rules
Victims Rights
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Corrections
Court Rules
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Law Enforcement
Legislators
Municipalities
Public Defender
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Uniform Rules
Victims Rights