AK HCR23 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 49, relating to women's health services and defining "medically necessary abortion" for purposes of making payments under the state Medicaid program.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 49
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 23 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N4 A1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
2014-04-13 | House | VERSION: HCR 23 |
2014-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-13 | House | PASSED Y30 N10 |
2014-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-10 | House | HELD TO 4/13 CALENDAR |
2014-04-09 | House | HELD TO 4/10 CALENDAR |
2014-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | RLS |
2014-02-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Abortion
Death
Families
Federal Aid
Health & Social Services
Medical Care
Physicians
Planning
Public Assistance
Uniform Rules
Women
Death
Families
Federal Aid
Health & Social Services
Medical Care
Physicians
Planning
Public Assistance
Uniform Rules
Women