AK HCR22 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - FEDERAL LIAISON: REAR ADMIRAL OSTEBO, USC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing and relating to the Alaska Northern Waters Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Northern Waters Task Force

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-23 FEDERAL LIAISON: REAR ADMIRAL OSTEBO, USC
2010-08-27 FEDERAL: APPOINTMENT PENDING
2010-08-27 EXECUTIVE BRANCH: LARRY HARTIG, CORA CAMPBELL (ALTERNATE)
2010-08-27 CHUCK GREENE, DAVE KUBIAK
2010-08-27 PUBLIC: EDWARD ITTA, CHRIS HLADICK, DENISE MICHELS,
2010-08-27 MEMBERS: HERRON, JOULE, EDGMON (ALTERNATE)
2010-08-27 MEMBERS: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, OLSON (ALTERNATE)
2010-08-27 PERMANENTLY FILED 8/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 54
2010-07-09 11:27 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-17 VERSION: CSHCR 22(FIN)
2010-04-17 RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2010-04-17 PASSED Y19 N- A1
2010-04-17 BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2010-04-17 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-17 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010
2010-04-16 FN2: (LEG)
2010-04-16 DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS
2010-04-16 FIN RPT 7DP
2010-04-11 FIN
2010-04-11 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-04-10 VERSION: CSHCR 22(FIN)
2010-04-10 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-04-10 PASSED Y40
2010-04-10 FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-10 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-10 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2010
2010-04-09 FN2: (LEG)
2010-04-09 NR: STOLTZE, HAWKER
2010-04-09 DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, KELLY, SALMON
2010-04-09 FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
2010-03-31 FN1: (LEG)
2010-03-31 NR: KELLER
2010-03-31 DP: HARRIS, CISSNA, GARDNER, MUNOZ, HERRON
2010-03-31 CRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP 1NR
2010-03-24 CRA, FIN
2010-03-24 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback