AK HCR2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Urging Governor Bill Walker to join with the Alaska State Legislature to address the presence of adverse childhood experiences and childhood trauma as factors for many societal issues by establishing a statewide policy, supporting evidence-based programs, and funding research for statewide solutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Respond To Adverse Childhood Experiences

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-06 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
2018-04-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BISHOP, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF
2018-04-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER
2018-04-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER
2018-04-09SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
2018-04-09SenateHSS
2018-04-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-06HouseVERSION: CSHCR 2(STA)
2018-04-06HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-06HousePASSED Y28 N8 E4
2018-04-06HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-06HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-04-05HouseHELD TO 4/6 CALENDAR
2018-04-04HouseHELD TO 4/5 CALENDAR
2018-04-02HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/2 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR
2018-03-30HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/30 - ON 4/2 CALENDAR
2018-03-29HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR
2018-03-28HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 3/28 - ON 3/29 CALENDAR
2018-03-27HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/27 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR
2018-03-26HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/26 - ON 3/27 CALENDAR
2018-03-23HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/23 - ON 3/26 CALENDAR
2018-03-22HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/22 - ON 3/23 CALENDAR
2018-03-21HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/21 - ON 3/22 CALENDAR
2018-03-20HouseNOT TAKEN UP 3/20 - ON 3/21 CALENDAR
2018-03-19HouseHELD TO 3/20 CALENDAR
2018-03-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2018
2018-02-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-02-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SEATON
2018-02-12HouseFN2: ZERO(LEG)
2018-02-12HouseNR: BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, JOHNSON
2018-02-12HouseDP: TUCK, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-02-12HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 3DP 4NR
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
2017-03-24HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-24HouseHSS RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-01-23HouseHSS, STA
2017-01-23HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback