AK HCR19 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-28 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging Governor Bill Walker to recognize a linguistic emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor: Ak Native Languages Emergency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-28 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-28HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-28HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N2 E4
2018-04-28HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-04-26HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-04-25SenateVERSION: SCS CSHCR 19(RLS) AM S
2018-04-25SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-04-25SenateCOSTELLO, VON IMHOF, GARDNER, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, MEYER
2018-04-25SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, MICCICHE, STEVENS, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, BISHOP
2018-04-25SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-25SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2018-04-25Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-04-25SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-25SenateRLS SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-25SenateBEFORE THE SENATE IN SECOND READING
2018-04-25SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
2018-04-25SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-25SenateAM: GARDNER
2018-04-25SenateDP: MICCICHE
2018-04-25SenateNR: MEYER, MACKINNON, KELLY
2018-04-25SenateRLS RPT SCS 1DP 3NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2018-04-24SenateRETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE UC
2018-04-24SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-23SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/23 - ON 4/24 CALENDAR
2018-04-23SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2018
2018-04-20SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-20SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
2018-04-20SenateSTA RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
2018-04-11SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-11SenateDP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN
2018-04-11SenateCRA RPT 3DP
2018-03-21SenateCRA, STA
2018-03-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-19HouseVERSION: CSHCR 19(CRA) AM
2018-03-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND, TUCK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-03-19HousePASSED Y34 N4 E2
2018-03-19HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2018-03-19HouseCRA CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, GARA
2018-03-15HouseHELD TO 3/19 CALENDAR
2018-03-14HouseHELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
2018-03-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2018
2018-03-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-03-09HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-03-09HouseDP: SADDLER, DRUMMOND, LINCOLN, RAUSCHER, PARISH
2018-03-09HouseCRA RPT CS(CRA) 5DP
2018-03-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-02-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
2018-02-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH, EDGMON, FOSTER, KOPP, LINCOLN
2018-02-16HouseCRA
2018-02-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback