AK HCR19 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the Alaska Industrial Development and Export Authority to present a business case to the Alaska State Legislature that includes a method for financing, a plan to solicit proposals for a public and private venture, and an analysis of the economic feasibility of a state-built and privately operated fuel storage facility that would serve the public interest by providing Alaskans with a reliable source of jet fuel, diesel, and gasoline at competitive prices.
Title
Aidea Report On In-state Fuel Storage
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hawker [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Michael Kelly [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
Rep. Jay Ramras [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2010-04-11 | NR: BUNDE | |
2010-04-11 | DP: PASKVAN, DAVIS, MEYER | |
2010-04-11 | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR | |
2010-04-06 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-05 | VERSION: HCR 19 | |
2010-04-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-05 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-04-05 | PASSED Y32 N5 E3 | |
2010-04-05 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E3 | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | COSPONSOR(S): HAWKER, KELLY | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2010-03-29 | NR: JOULE, DOOGAN, GARA, N.FOSTER, SALMON | |
2010-03-29 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, KELLY, THOMAS, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-03-29 | FIN RPT 5DP 5NR | |
2010-03-04 | FN1: ZERO(H.L&C) | |
2010-03-04 | NR: LYNN, OLSON | |
2010-03-04 | DNP: T.WILSON | |
2010-03-04 | DP: BUCH, NEUMAN, CHENAULT | |
2010-03-04 | L&C RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR | |
2010-01-27 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-01-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Attorney General
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Business
Economic Development
Economy
Energy
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Military
Motor Vehicles
Oil & Gas
Attorney General
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Business
Economic Development
Economy
Energy
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Military
Motor Vehicles
Oil & Gas
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=HCR19 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/HCR019A.PDF |