AK HCR15 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Task Force on Unmanned Aircraft Systems.
Title
Task Force On Unmanned Aircraft Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-15 | House | FN2: (LEG) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSHCR 15(FIN) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN2: (LEG) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: KELLY, DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, OLSON, FAIRCLOUGH |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2014-04-07 | Senate | FIN |
2014-04-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-04 | House | VERSION: CSHCR 15(FIN) |
2014-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON |
2014-04-04 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 |
2014-04-04 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2014 |
2014-03-27 | House | FN2: (LEG) |
2014-03-27 | House | COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-27 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, NEUMAN, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, |
2014-03-27 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP |
2014-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON |
2014-03-20 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2014-03-20 | House | FN1: (LEG) |
2014-03-20 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON |
2014-03-20 | House | DP: MILLETT, REINBOLD, SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2014-03-20 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR |
2014-01-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2014-01-21 | House | L&C |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Aviation
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Governor
Law Enforcement
Legislative Committees
Privacy
Public Safety
Rights
Science & Technology
Universities
Warfare
Weapons
Boards & Commissions
Civil Procedure
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Governor
Law Enforcement
Legislative Committees
Privacy
Public Safety
Rights
Science & Technology
Universities
Warfare
Weapons