AK HCR13 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-17 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicating the House Finance Committee Room in the Alaska State Capitol to the late Representative Albert "Al" P. Sikkiagruk Adams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicating The Al Adams Committee Room

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-17HousePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 LEGIS RESOLVE 9
2017-10-06House12:23 PM 10/5/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-05-17SenateVERSION: HCR 13
2017-05-17SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-05-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-05-17SenateMICCICHE, HUGHES, GARDNER, BEGICH, EGAN, COGHILL, MEYER, OLSON, KELLY, STEDMAN
2017-05-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, DUNLEAVY, MACKINNON, COSTELLO, BISHOP, STEVENS,
2017-05-17SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-05-17SenateTAKEN UP UC
2017-05-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
2017-05-16HouseVERSION: HCR 13
2017-05-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-16HouseGUTTENBERG
2017-05-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, CHENAULT, TARR, STUTES, GARA, KITO, FANSLER, DRUMMOND,
2017-05-16HousePASSED Y39 E1
2017-05-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-15HouseNOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 5/16 CALENDAR
2017-05-15HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2017
2017-05-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback