AK HCR10 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Heart Month
Title
American Heart Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-03-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | DP: WILSON, REINBOLD, BEGICH, HUGHES |
2022-03-11 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP |
2022-02-22 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO |
2022-02-22 | Senate | HSS |
2022-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-16 | House | VERSION: HCR 10 |
2022-02-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-02-16 | House | RASMUSSEN |
2022-02-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ, SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON, MCCABE, RAUSCHER, |
2022-02-16 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1 |
2022-02-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.RLS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES) |
2022-02-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-02-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2022-02-09 | House | RLS |
2022-02-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |