AK HCR1 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing an amendment to the Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature relating to voting and abstention from voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend Uniform Rules: Abstain From Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-10 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06HousePERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (H)
2017-04-10HouseVERSION: CSHCR 1(STA) AM(FLD H)
2017-04-10HouseENGROSSED
2017-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STUTES, GARA
2017-04-10HouseFAILED PASSAGE Y21 N19
2017-04-10HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
2017-04-10HouseAM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
2017-04-10HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-10HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-09HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/9 - ON 4/10 CALENDAR
2017-04-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2017-04-08HouseNOT TAKEN UP 4/8 - ON 4/9 CALENDAR
2017-04-07HouseHELD TO 4/8 CALENDAR
2017-04-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
2017-04-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-04-03HouseNR: JOHNSON, WOOL, KNOPP
2017-04-03HouseDNP: BIRCH
2017-04-03HouseDP: LEDOUX, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-03HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 3DP 1DNP 3NR
2017-03-31HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-03-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-02-10HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2017-02-10HouseAM: KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER
2017-02-10HouseDNP: EASTMAN, KOPP, REINBOLD
2017-02-10HouseDP: CLAMAN
2017-02-10HouseJUD RPT 1DP 3DNP 2AM
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-01-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2017-01-20HouseSTA REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2017-01-20HouseSTA REFERRAL REMOVED
2017-01-20HouseSTA, JUD
2017-01-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback