AK HB99 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN2: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN2: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the State Physical Therapy and Occupational Therapy Board; relating to the practice of physical therapy; and relating to the practice of occupational therapy.
Title
Physical/occupational Therapy Bd/practice
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Claman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/30/22 |
2022-10-05 | House | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 9/1 CHAPTER 66 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | House | 9:40 A.M. 8/9/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: HB 99 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 99 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2022-05-12 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2022-01-28 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS |
2022-01-28 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2021-05-19 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-18 | House | VERSION: HB 99 |
2021-05-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-18 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 99 |
2021-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-04-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-12 | House | NR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON |
2021-04-12 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-12 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 2NR |
2021-03-15 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-03-15 | House | DP: SNYDER, NELSON, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-15 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2021-02-19 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2021-02-19 | House | HSS REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-02-18 | House | HSS, L&C |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |