AK HB93 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - COSPONSOR(S): PRAX
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-24 - COSPONSOR(S): PRAX
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a lumber grading training program and lumber grading certificates; relating to use of lumber graded and certified by a person holding a lumber grading training program certificate; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Lumber Grading Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2023-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY, GALVIN, COULOMBE |
2023-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT |
2023-04-06 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-06 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2023-04-03 | House | FN1: (DNR) |
2023-04-03 | House | DP: CARRICK, RUFFRIDGE, PRAX, WRIGHT, SUMNER |
2023-04-03 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2023-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CRONK |
2023-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2023-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, TOMASZEWSKI, HIMSCHOOT |
2023-03-06 | House | L&C |
2023-03-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Agriculture
Buildings
Business
Construction
Contractors
Forestry
Housing
Licensing
Planning
Sales
Science & Technology
Buildings
Business
Construction
Contractors
Forestry
Housing
Licensing
Planning
Sales
Science & Technology
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=HB93 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/HB0093A.PDF |