AK HB93 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - FN3: (EED) RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - FN3: (EED) RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the authorization, monitoring, and operation of charter schools.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] |
Rep. Pete Higgins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | FN3: (EED) RECEIVED |
2014-04-03 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(EED) RECEIVED |
2014-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) RECEIVED |
2014-04-02 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-02 | House | FN(S) FORTHCOMING |
2014-04-02 | House | AM: P.WILSON, SEATON, KITO III |
2014-04-02 | House | NR: REINBOLD, LEDOUX, SADDLER |
2014-04-02 | House | DP: GATTIS |
2014-04-02 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 1DP 3NR 3AM |
2013-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIGGINS |
2013-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, REINBOLD |
2013-01-30 | House | EDC, FIN |
2013-01-30 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |