AK HB91 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting veterinarians from the requirements of the controlled substance prescription database.
Title
Controlled Sub. Data: Exempt Veterinarian
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Mike Prax [R] | Rep. Ken McCarty [R] |
Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. David Nelson [R] | Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Sen. James Kaufman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN |
2022-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2021-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2021-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2021-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-02-18 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2021-02-18 | House | L&C, RES |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Animals
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Business
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Licensing
Medical Care
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB91 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0091A.PDF |