AK HB91 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of naturopathy; relating to the licensure of naturopaths; relating to the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Naturopaths: Licensing; Practice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-16 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2020-03-16 | House | NR: STORY, STUTES |
2020-03-16 | House | DP: HANNAN, GILLIS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2020-03-16 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 2NR |
2020-01-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2019-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2019-03-13 | House | L&C, FIN |
2019-03-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Education
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Mental Health
Occupations & Professions
Universities
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Mental Health
Occupations & Professions
Universities
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB91 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0091A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0091B.PDF |