AK HB89 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the disposal of certain bedload material in conjunction with a flood mitigation plan.
Title
Extraction Of Bedload Material
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Seaton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2012-04-15 | FN5: INDETERMINATE(DOT) | |
2012-04-15 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2012-04-15 | NR: OLSON | |
2012-04-15 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2012-04-15 | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2011-04-15 | FIN | |
2011-04-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-14 | VERSION: CSHB 89(RES) | |
2011-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-04-14 | PASSED Y39 E1 | |
2011-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 89(RES) | |
2011-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-14 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(DOT) | |
2011-04-12 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2011-04-12 | STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-04-12 | DP: DOOGAN, EDGMON, COSTELLO, NEUMAN, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, FAIRCLOUGH, | |
2011-04-12 | FIN RPT CS(RES) NT 10DP | |
2011-03-23 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2011-03-23 | NR: HERRON, DICK, GARDNER, MUNOZ | |
2011-03-23 | DP: P.WILSON, SEATON, FEIGE | |
2011-03-23 | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 3DP 4NR | |
2011-01-18 | RES, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11 |