AK HB88 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-04 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-04 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to an annual report concerning the payment of equal pay for comparable work; increasing the minimum wage; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Equal Pay & Minimum Wage Act
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Liz Snyder [D] |
Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2021-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-02-18 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, L&C |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB88 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0088A.PDF |