AK HB87 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to participation in matters before the Board of Fisheries and the Board of Game by the members of the respective boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conflict Of Interest: Bd Fisheries/game

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-29SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-03-29SenateSTA, RES
2017-03-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-27HouseVERSION: CSHB 87(FSH)
2017-03-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-03-27HousePASSED Y27 N11 E2
2017-03-27HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-03-27HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E3
2017-03-27HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-03-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 87(FSH)
2017-03-24HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/27 CALENDAR
2017-03-24HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-24HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2017
2017-03-22HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2017-03-22HouseAM: PARISH
2017-03-22HouseNR: DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, RAUSCHER, TALERICO, BIRCH
2017-03-22HouseDP: WESTLAKE, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2017-03-22HouseRES RPT CS(FSH) NT 3DP 5NR 1AM
2017-02-15HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2017-02-15HouseAM: EASTMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, CHENAULT
2017-02-15HouseNR: FANSLER
2017-02-15HouseDP: TARR, STUTES
2017-02-15HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 2DP 1NR 3AM
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-01-30HouseFSH, RES
2017-01-30HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback