AK HB86 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to nonrenewal of occupational licenses for default on a student loan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Loan Default/occ. License Renewal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-03-12SenateFN2: ZERO(EED)
2018-03-12SenateNR: STEVENS, MICCICHE, MEYER
2018-03-12SenateDP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
2018-03-12SenateL&C RPT 2DP 3NR
2017-04-14SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2017-04-14SenateDP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL, HUGHES
2017-04-14SenateEDC RPT 4DP
2017-03-31SenateEDC, L&C
2017-03-31SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-29HouseVERSION: HB 86
2017-03-29HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-03-29HousePASSED Y36 N4
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 86
2017-03-29HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-29HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-29HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2017
2017-03-27HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2017-03-27HouseNR: KNOPP
2017-03-27HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
2017-03-27HouseL&C RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-03-01HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2017-03-01HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, KOPP, SPOHNHOLZ, JOHNSTON, FANSLER, DRUMMOND
2017-03-01HouseEDC RPT 7DP
2017-01-27HouseEDC, L&C
2017-01-27HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback