AK HB85 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska Banking Code; relating to mutual savings banks; relating to interstate state banks and international banks; relating to the pledging of bank assets as collateral security to tribal organizations; relating to the pledging of bank assets for interest swap agreements; relating to state business licenses; relating to persons who make loans secured by interests in vessels or facilities; relating to liability for the release or threatened release of hazardous substances; relating to the Model Foreign Bank Loan Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Financial Institutions; Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 20 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 4:00 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-05 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E5 A2 |
2022-05-05 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-03 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-02 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 85(L&C) |
2022-05-02 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-02 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2022-05-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 85(L&C) |
2022-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/2 CAL |
2022-04-29 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2022-04-06 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, VON IMHOF |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(L&C) 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2022-01-21 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(CED) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(CED) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DEC) |
2022-01-21 | Senate | NR: REVAK |
2022-01-21 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS |
2022-01-21 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2021-05-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 85(L&C) |
2021-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, SCHRAGE |
2021-05-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-14 | House | PASSED Y35 N2 E3 |
2021-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 85(L&C) |
2021-05-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-14 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | FN4: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-05-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-13 | House | NR: CARPENTER, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2021-05-13 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK |
2021-05-13 | House | FIN RPT CS(L&C) 6DP 4NR |
2021-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MERRICK, RASMUSSEN |
2021-04-22 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(DEC) |
2021-04-22 | House | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-04-22 | House | NR: KAUFMAN |
2021-04-22 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-22 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 5DP 1NR |
2021-02-18 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Business
Consumer Affairs
Finance
Financial Institutions
Hazardous Substances
Loans
Native Organizations
Property
Securities
Vessels
Consumer Affairs
Finance
Financial Institutions
Hazardous Substances
Loans
Native Organizations
Property
Securities
Vessels