AK HB83 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to new defined benefit tiers in the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers & Pub Employee Retirement Plans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2018-04-06HouseFN2: (ADM)
2018-04-06HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2018-04-06HouseNR: KNOPP
2018-04-06HouseDNP: BIRCH
2018-04-06HouseDP: TUCK, LEDOUX, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-04-06HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1DNP 1NR
2018-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-02-21HouseFN2: (ADM)
2018-02-21HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2018-02-21HouseDNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH
2018-02-21HouseDP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO
2018-02-21HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 2DNP
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-03-31HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-01-27HouseL&C, STA, FIN
2017-01-27HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback