AK HB83 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to new defined benefit tiers in the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the public employees' retirement system and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Teachers & Pub Employee Retirement Plans
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] |
Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-04-06 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-04-06 | House | NR: KNOPP |
2018-04-06 | House | DNP: BIRCH |
2018-04-06 | House | DP: TUCK, LEDOUX, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-04-06 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 1DNP 1NR |
2018-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2018-02-21 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2018-02-21 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-02-21 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH |
2018-02-21 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2018-02-21 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 2DNP |
2017-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2017-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH |
2017-01-27 | House | L&C, STA, FIN |
2017-01-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |