AK HB80 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the sport fishing enhancement account; establishing the sport fishing enhancement surcharge; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Spt Fsh Hatchery Facil Acct; Surcharge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Fisheries CS (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Fisheries CS (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FN2: (DFG) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | AM: KIEHL, KAWASAKI |
2021-05-14 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2021-05-14 | Senate | DP: REVAK, STEVENS |
2021-05-14 | Senate | RES RPT 2DP 1NR 2AM |
2021-05-11 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RES |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 80(FSH) |
2021-05-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-07 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 N1 E2 |
2021-05-07 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E2 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 80(FSH) |
2021-05-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-07 | House | FSH CS ADOPTED Y32 N4 E2 A2 |
2021-05-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2021-04-26 | House | NR: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-26 | House | DP: LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL |
2021-04-26 | House | FIN RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 4DP 6NR |
2021-03-10 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2021-03-10 | House | AM: ORTIZ |
2021-03-10 | House | NR: MCCABE |
2021-03-10 | House | DP: VANCE, STUTES, KREISS-TOMKINS, STORY, TARR |
2021-03-10 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR 1AM |
2021-02-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-18 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2021-02-18 | House | FSH, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |