AK HB80 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act adopting the Municipal Property Assessed Clean Energy Act; authorizing municipalities to establish programs to impose assessments for energy improvements in regions designated by municipalities; imposing fees; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muni Energy Improvemnt:assessmnts/bonds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/8/17
2017-10-06HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 9/7 CHAPTER 25 SLA 17
2017-10-06House1:54 PM 8/30/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-04-21HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-04-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-17HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N1 E3 A1
2017-04-17HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-04-17HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-04-16SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 80(FIN)
2017-04-16SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-04-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-16SenatePASSED Y17 N2 E1
2017-04-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): EGAN
2017-04-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 80(FIN)
2017-04-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-16SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-16SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-16SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017
2017-03-15SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-15SenateNR: MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, DUNLEAVY, OLSON, MICCICHE
2017-03-15SenateDP: HOFFMAN
2017-03-15SenateFIN RPT SCS 1DP 5NR SAME TITLE
2017-02-13SenateFIN
2017-02-13SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-10HouseVERSION: CSHB 80(ENE)
2017-02-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, JOSEPHSON, PARISH, SEATON, DRUMMOND, GARA, KITO, TUCK
2017-02-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-02-10HousePASSED Y36 N1 E3
2017-02-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 80(ENE)
2017-02-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, FANSLER, TARR
2017-02-08HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/10 CALENDAR
2017-02-08HouseENE CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-08HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/8/2017
2017-02-08HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-02-08HouseDP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, SADDLER, TALERICO, RAUSCHER, FANSLER, PARISH
2017-02-08HouseCRA RPT CS(ENE) 7DP
2017-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-02-03HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-02-03HouseNR: RAUSCHER, JOHNSON
2017-02-03HouseDP: JOHNSTON, WESTLAKE, SPOHNHOLZ, CLAMAN, WOOL
2017-02-03HouseENE RPT CS(ENE) 5DP 2NR
2017-01-25HouseENE, CRA
2017-01-25HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback