AK HB79 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to workers' compensation; relating to the second injury fund; relating to service fees and civil penalties for the workers' safety programs and the workers' compensation program; relating to incorporation of reference materials in workers' compensation regulations; excluding independent contractors from workers' compensation coverage; establishing the circumstances under which certain nonemployee executive corporate officers and members of limited liability companies may obtain workers' compensation coverage; establishing a legislative workers' compensation working group; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus Workers' Compensation

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N6
2018-05-12HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 33
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 79(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 79(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/11/18
2018-05-11SenateFN8: (LWF)
2018-05-11SenateFN7: (LWF)
2018-05-11SenateFN5: (ADM)
2018-05-11SenateAM: OLSON
2018-05-11SenateNR: MICCICHE
2018-05-11SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
2018-05-11SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 33
2018-05-11SenateFIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2018-04-04SenateFN8: (LWF)
2018-04-04SenateFN7: (LWF)
2018-04-04SenateFN6: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
2018-04-04SenateFN5: (ADM)
2018-04-04SenateDP: GARDNER
2018-04-04SenateNR: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, MEYER
2018-04-04SenateL&C RPT 1DP 3NR
2018-03-14SenateL&C, FIN
2018-03-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-12HouseVERSION: CSHB 79(FIN)
2018-03-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N10 E1
2018-03-12HousePASSED Y25 N14 E1
2018-03-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 79(FIN)
2018-03-09HouseHELD TO 3/12 CALENDAR
2018-03-07HouseHELD TO 3/9 CALENDAR
2018-03-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/7 CALENDAR
2018-03-05HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018
2018-02-21HouseFN8: (LWF)
2018-02-21HouseFN7: (LWF)
2018-02-21HouseFN6: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
2018-02-21HouseFN5: (ADM)
2018-02-21HouseAM: KAWASAKI, PRUITT
2018-02-21HouseNR: ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GRENN
2018-02-21HouseDNP: WILSON, TILTON
2018-02-21HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-21HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 2DNP 3NR 2AM
2017-04-14HouseFN4: (LWF)
2017-04-14HouseFN3: (LWF)
2017-04-14HouseFN1: (ADM)
2017-04-14HouseNR: EASTMAN, KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, REINBOLD
2017-04-14HouseDP: LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2017-04-14HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 2DP 5NR
2017-03-24HouseFN3: (LWF)
2017-03-24HouseFN2: (LWF)
2017-03-24HouseFN1: (ADM)
2017-03-24HouseAM: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH
2017-03-24HouseNR: WOOL
2017-03-24HouseDNP: KNOPP
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOSEPHSON, STUTES, KITO
2017-03-24HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 1DNP 1NR 2AM
2017-01-25HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2017-01-25HouseFN3: (LWF)
2017-01-25HouseFN2: (LWF)
2017-01-25HouseFN1: (ADM)
2017-01-25HouseL&C, JUD, FIN
2017-01-25HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback