AK HB78 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/22/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/22/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the second Monday of October of each year as Indigenous Peoples Day.
Title
Indigenous Peoples Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/22/17 |
2017-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 15 SLA 17 |
2017-06-12 | House | 10:14 AM 6/12/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: HB 78 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | STEVENS, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, STEDMAN, MEYER, MICCICHE |
2017-04-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN, BEGICH, HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017 |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-04-14 | Senate | NR: WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL |
2017-04-14 | Senate | DP: MEYER, EGAN |
2017-04-14 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 3NR |
2017-03-01 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, GARDNER, MACKINNON |
2017-03-01 | Senate | CRA RPT 4DP |
2017-02-06 | Senate | CRA, STA |
2017-02-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-02-03 | House | VERSION: HB 78 |
2017-02-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-02-03 | House | PASSED Y31 N7 E2 |
2017-02-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON, GRENN, KAWASAKI, CLAMAN, SEATON, GARA |
2017-02-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/3 CALENDAR |
2017-02-01 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N25 A1 |
2017-02-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2017 |
2017-02-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-02-01 | House | NR: TALERICO, RAUSCHER |
2017-02-01 | House | DP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, PARISH |
2017-02-01 | House | CRA RPT 4DP 2NR |
2017-01-25 | House | CRA |
2017-01-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |