AK HB78 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing a loan repayment program and employment incentive program for certain health care professionals employed in the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medical Provider Incentives/loan Repaym't
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2012-05-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/22 CHAPTER 25 SLA 12 | |
2012-05-16 | 4:51 PM 5/16/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-05-08 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2012-04-30 | FN4: (DHS) | |
2012-04-30 | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284 | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-14 | VERSION: CSHB 78(FIN) | |
2012-04-14 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2012-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-04-14 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 78(FIN) | |
2012-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2012 | |
2012-04-13 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER, MENARD, DAVIS, THOMAS, DYSON, GIESSEL | |
2012-04-13 | FN4: (DHS) | |
2012-04-13 | FN3: ZERO(EED) | |
2012-04-13 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE | |
2012-04-13 | FIN RPT 5DP | |
2012-03-28 | FIN | |
2012-03-28 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-03-26 | VERSION: CSHB 78(FIN) | |
2012-03-26 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-03-26 | CISSNA | |
2012-03-26 | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, HOLMES, KERTTULA, COSTELLO, JOHNSON, OLSON, LYNN, | |
2012-03-26 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-03-26 | PASSED Y39 E1 | |
2012-03-26 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 78(FIN) | |
2012-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-26 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-03-26 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-03-26 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2012 | |
2012-03-16 | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GARA, STOLTZE | |
2012-03-16 | FN4: (DHS) | |
2012-03-16 | FN3: ZERO(EED) | |
2012-03-16 | EDGMON, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-03-16 | DP: DOOGAN, FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, GARA, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, | |
2012-03-16 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 11DP | |
2011-03-23 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK | |
2011-03-18 | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT | |
2011-03-18 | FN2: (DHS) | |
2011-03-18 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2011-03-18 | NR: KELLER | |
2011-03-18 | DP: MILLETT, MILLER, HERRON | |
2011-03-18 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 1NR | |
2011-03-09 | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE | |
2011-02-02 | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON | |
2011-01-18 | HSS, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/11 |
Subjects
Dentists
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Employment
Grants
Health & Social Services
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Public Assistance
Senior Citizens
State Aid
Universities
Unorganized Borough