AK HB74 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a veteran's designation on an identification card or a driver's license for Hmong veterans and Lao veterans; relating to the implementation of the federal REAL ID Act of 2005; relating to issuance of identification cards and drivers' licenses; relating to data sharing by the Department of Administration; relating to special motor vehicle registration plates for recipients of the Bronze Star awarded for valor, Silver Star, Navy Cross, Distinguished Service Cross, Air Force Cross, Coast Guard Cross, and other awards reflecting valor; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License & Id Cards;real Id Act;lic Plates

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 14 as amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 as amended (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 10 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 14 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-05-16SenateFIN
2017-05-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-15HouseVERSION: CSHB 74(FIN) AM
2017-05-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-15HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y27 N13
2017-05-15HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2017-05-13HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-05-13HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N6 E6
2017-05-13HousePASSED Y25 N9 E6
2017-05-13HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 14 AS AM ADOPTED Y27 N7 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM 1 TO AM 14 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 14 OFFERED
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 13 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-05-13HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-05-13House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 8 ADOPTED Y19 N15 E6
2017-05-13HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADP)AM 8 UC
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 12 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 11 FAILED Y10 N24 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 10 AS AM FAILED Y15 N19 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM 1 TO AM 10 ADOPTED Y27 N7 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 10 OFFERED
2017-05-13HouseAM 1 TO AM 9 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 9 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 8 ADOPTED Y20 N14 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 7 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N20 E6
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y26 N7 E6 A1
2017-05-13HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADP)AM 1 UC
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 4 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 3 AS AM ADOPTED UC
2017-05-13HouseAM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-13HouseBEFORE HOUSE WITH AM NO 3 PENDING
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2017-05-13HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y20 N14 E6
2017-05-13HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-05-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 74(FIN)
2017-05-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CALENDAR
2017-05-12HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-05-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2017
2017-05-10HouseFN4: (ADM)
2017-05-10HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-05-10HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-05-10HouseAM: KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, STUTES, WILSON
2017-05-10HouseDP: GRENN, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-05-10HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 4DP 7AM
2017-04-12HouseFN3: (ADM)
2017-04-12HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-12HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-04-12HouseNR: LEDOUX, BIRCH, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-12HouseDNP: JOHNSON, TUCK
2017-04-12HouseDP: WOOL
2017-04-12HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 1DP 2DNP 3NR
2017-01-23HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2017-01-23HouseFN3: (ADM)
2017-01-23HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-01-23HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-01-23HouseSTA, FIN
2017-01-23HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB74
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0074A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0074B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0074C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0074D.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1385&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1388&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1393&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1399&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1400&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1401&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1403&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1406&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1407&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1415&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB74&jrn=1387&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback