AK HB74 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska coastal management program; and establishing the Alaska Coastal Policy Board.
Title
Coastal Management Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-05 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2010-03-24 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN | |
2010-03-15 | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON, N.FOSTER, SALMON, AUSTERMAN, THOMAS | |
2009-03-05 | REFERRED TO RESOURCES | |
2009-03-05 | FN2: (DNR) | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: (DEC) | |
2009-03-05 | NR: KELLER, CISSNA, HERRON, MUNOZ | |
2009-03-05 | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 4NR | |
2009-01-20 | CRA, RES, FIN | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-20 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09 |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Coastal Management
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Hazardous Substances
Hearings
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Municipalities
Permits
Planning
Subsistence
Water
Zoning
Coastal Management
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Hazardous Substances
Hearings
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Municipalities
Permits
Planning
Subsistence
Water
Zoning