AK HB71 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a vessel-based commercial fisheries limited entry system for the Bering Sea hair crab fishery; requiring the Commercial Fisheries Entry Commission to report biennially on the vessel-based limited entry fisheries system for the Bering Sea hair crab fishery; establishing the Alaska regional economic assistance program; requiring the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development to compile an annual report to the legislature regarding statewide and regional economic development projects and regional development organizations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Regional Economic Assistance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report? Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Recede from its Amendment to CSHB 71(FIN)? Effective Date (Y: 1 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-13 - House - House: Concur (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report? Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Recede from its Amendment to CSHB 71(FIN)? Effective Date (Y: 1 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-13 - House - House: Concur (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2014-03-26 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/25 CHAPTER 2 SLA 14 |
2014-03-20 | House | 12:48 PM 3/20/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-02-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-02-24 | House | FCC RPT ADPTD Y27 N8 E4 V1 FCCS CSHB 71 |
2014-02-24 | House | FN7: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-02-24 | House | FN6: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-02-24 | House | FN5: (CED) |
2014-02-24 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 9 |
2014-02-24 | House | FCC REPORT READ |
2014-02-24 | House | FCC REPORT: FCCS HB 71 RECEIVED (2/19/14) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FREE CC RPT ADPTD Y19 N- E1 FCCS HB 71 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FCC REPORT: FCCS HB 71 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FCC REPORT READ |
2014-02-21 | Senate | FCC REPORT RECEIVED (2/19/14) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | DUNLEAVY (CHAIR), GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-02-18 | Senate | FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2014-02-14 | House | HAWKER (CHAIR), OLSON, JOSEPHSON |
2014-02-14 | House | FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2014-02-14 | House | 2D CONFERENCE COMMITTEE DISCHARGED |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 2D CONFERENCE COMMITTEE DISCHARGED |
2014-02-12 | House | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2014-02-12 | Senate | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2014-01-29 | Senate | COGHILL (CHAIR), GARDNER, MICCICHE |
2014-01-29 | Senate | 2D CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2014-01-24 | House | PRUITT (CHAIR), LEDOUX, KAWASAKI |
2014-01-24 | House | 2D CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2014-01-21 | Senate | DISCHARGE REPORT RECEIVED |
2013-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2013-04-14 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE DISCHARGED |
2013-04-14 | Senate | STEDMAN (CHAIR), EGAN, FRENCH |
2013-04-14 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2013-04-14 | Senate | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y1 N19 |
2013-04-14 | Senate | RECEDE MESSAGE READ |
2013-04-13 | House | HUGHES (CHAIR), JOHNSON, TARR |
2013-04-13 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2013-04-13 | House | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y1 N37 E2 |
2013-04-13 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2013-04-13 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 71(FIN) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, ELLIS, EGAN |
2013-04-12 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 71(FIN) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DFG) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DFG) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | NR: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY |
2013-04-11 | Senate | DP: OLSON, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP |
2013-04-11 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 9 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE |
2013-04-06 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2013-04-06 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2013-04-06 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2013-04-06 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2013-03-28 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2013-03-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-03-27 | House | VERSION: CSHB 71(FIN) |
2013-03-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX, STOLTZE, JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2013-03-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-03-27 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2013-03-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 71(FIN) |
2013-03-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-27 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-03-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, P.WILSON, HAWKER, KREISS-TOMKINS, GRUENBERG |
2013-03-25 | House | JOHNSON, GATTIS |
2013-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, PRUITT, FOSTER, EDGMON, MUNOZ, HERRON, CHENAULT, |
2013-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HOLMES |
2013-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2013-03-20 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2013-03-20 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2013-03-20 | House | AUSTERMAN |
2013-03-20 | House | DP: T.WILSON, EDGMON, THOMPSON, NEUMAN, MUNOZ, HOLMES, COSTELLO, GARA, STOLTZE, |
2013-03-20 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP 1AM |
2013-03-07 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2013-03-07 | House | NR: MILLETT, REINBOLD, HERRON, CHENAULT, OLSON |
2013-03-07 | House | DP: JOSEPHSON |
2013-03-07 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 1DP 5NR |
2013-01-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |