AK HB7 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the exhibition of marked ballots and the prohibition on political persuasion near election polls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marked Ballot Photos; Persuasion At Polls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-03SenateREFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
2017-03-03SenateCRA, STA
2017-03-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-01HouseVERSION: CSHB 7(CRA)
2017-03-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-01HousePASSED Y32 N8
2017-03-01HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-03-01HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y14 N26
2017-03-01HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N26
2017-03-01HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2017-03-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 7(CRA)
2017-02-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/1 CALENDAR
2017-02-27HouseCRA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2017
2017-02-22HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2017-02-22HouseNR: TALERICO, FANSLER
2017-02-22HouseDP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2017-02-22HouseCRA RPT CS(CRA) NT 3DP 2NR
2017-02-06HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV)
2017-02-06HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-06HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP
2017-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KNOPP
2017-01-18HouseSTA, CRA
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback