AK HB68 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the division of labor standards and safety; relating to the division of workers' compensation; establishing the division of workers' safety and compensation; relating to employment of a minor; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Labor Stdrs/safety; Worker Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-13 | Senate | FIN |
2019-05-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 68(FIN) |
2019-05-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-13 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 E1 |
2019-05-13 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2019-05-13 | House | PRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2019-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-13 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2019-05-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 68(FIN) |
2019-05-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | FN3: (LWF) |
2019-05-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2019-05-07 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ |
2019-05-07 | House | WILSON, FOSTER |
2019-05-07 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, |
2019-05-07 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP 2NR |
2019-04-29 | House | FN2: (LWF) |
2019-04-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2019-04-29 | House | NR: HANNAN, STUTES |
2019-04-29 | House | DP: REVAK, TALERICO, LEDOUX |
2019-04-29 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 3DP 2NR |
2019-02-20 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2019-02-20 | House | FN2: (LWF) |
2019-02-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2019-02-20 | House | L&C, FIN |
2019-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |