AK HB66 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to voting, voter qualifications, and voter registration; relating to poll watchers; relating to absentee ballots and questioned ballots; relating to election worker compensation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections, Voting, Ballots

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-04-21HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA
2021-04-21HouseREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2021-04-21HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
2021-04-21HouseDNP: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA
2021-04-21HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN
2021-04-21HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3DNP
2021-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2021-04-09HouseSTA REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER JUD
2021-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2021-02-18HouseSTA, JUD
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback