AK HB64 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to regional fishery development associations; and relating to developing fishery management assessments.
Title
Fishery Development Assoc.; Assessments
Sponsors
Rep. Louise Stutes [R] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1.B - Page 9, line 23 (Y: 6 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Fisheries CS (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1.B - Page 9, line 23 (Y: 6 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Fisheries CS (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN4: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DFG) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DP: STEVENS |
2022-05-17 | Senate | NR: REVAK, KAWASAKI, MICCICHE, KIEHL |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RES RPT 4NR 1DP |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2022-05-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-10 | House | VERSION: CSHB 64(FSH) |
2022-05-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2022-05-10 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2022-05-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 64(FSH) |
2022-05-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR |
2022-05-09 | House | AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-09 | House | AM NO 1B FAILED Y6 N31 E3 |
2022-05-09 | House | AM NO 1A WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-09 | House | DIVIDE THE AMENDMENT UC |
2022-05-09 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2022-05-09 | House | FSH CS ADOPTED Y35 N2 E3 |
2022-05-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2022-03-02 | House | FN4: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-03-02 | House | FN3: ZERO(DFG) |
2022-03-02 | House | NR: RASMUSSEN, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK |
2022-03-02 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, FOSTER |
2022-03-02 | House | FIN RPT CS(FSH) 5DP 4NR |
2021-04-21 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2021-04-21 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2021-04-21 | House | NR: MCCABE, VANCE |
2021-04-21 | House | DP: STORY, STUTES, KREISS-TOMKINS, TARR |
2021-04-21 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) 4DP 2NR |
2021-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-02-18 | House | FSH, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21 |