AK HB64 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/10/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/10/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the establishment of the Legislative Task Force on Reading Proficiency and Dyslexia.
Title
Reading Proficiency Task Force; Dyslexia
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/10/18 |
2018-07-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/12 CHAPTER 52 SLA 18 |
2018-07-10 | House | 10:13 AM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-08 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-01 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 16 |
2018-05-01 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 E2 |
2018-05-01 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-04-28 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-04-27 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 64(EDC) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-27 | Senate | VON IMHOF, MEYER, WILSON, HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2018-04-27 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS, MACKINNON, SHOWER, GIESSEL, STEDMAN, BISHOP |
2018-04-27 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 64(EDC) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-27 | Senate | EDC SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-27 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-27 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, GARDNER |
2018-02-05 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL, HUGHES |
2018-02-05 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 16 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | EDC RPT SCS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | EDC |
2017-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-24 | House | VERSION: CSHB 64(EDC) |
2017-03-24 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2017-03-24 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E4 |
2017-03-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 64(EDC) |
2017-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, TARR |
2017-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR |
2017-03-22 | House | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2017-03-10 | House | DP: TALERICO, PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, JOHNSTON, FANSLER, DRUMMOND |
2017-03-10 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 7DP |
2017-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TALERICO |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2017-01-20 | House | EDC |
2017-01-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appointments
Assessments
Boards & Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Funds
Government Organization
Governor
Legislature
Schools
Teachers
Universities
Assessments
Boards & Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Funds
Government Organization
Governor
Legislature
Schools
Teachers
Universities