AK HB63 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the duties of the Department of Transportation and Public Facilities; renaming the Alaska Marine Transportation Advisory Board the Alaska Marine Highway Operations Board; relating to the membership and duties of the Alaska Marine Highway Operations Board; and relating to the comprehensive, intermodal, long-range transportation plan for the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Marine Highway Operations Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
2021-08-16HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 20 SLA 21
2021-08-16House4:46 P.M. 7/2/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-07HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2021-05-19HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1
2021-05-19HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2021-05-19HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2021-05-18SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 63(TRA)
2021-05-18SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2021-05-18SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
2021-05-18SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2021-05-18SenateHUGHES NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2021-05-18SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2021-05-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, STEVENS, BISHOP, HOLLAND, STEDMAN, MICCICHE
2021-05-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 63(TRA)
2021-05-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-18SenateTRA SCS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-05-17SenateFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2021-05-17SenateDP: MYERS, KIEHL, MICCICHE
2021-05-17SenateTRA RPT SCS 3DP SAME TITLE
2021-05-07SenateTRA
2021-05-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-05HouseVERSION: CSHB 63(STA)
2021-05-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2021-05-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY, JOSEPHSON, TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, WOOL, VANCE
2021-05-05HousePASSED Y37 E3
2021-05-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 63(STA)
2021-05-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-05HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2021
2021-05-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2021-04-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2021-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2021-04-26HouseDP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-04-26HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 6DP
2021-03-20HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2021-03-20HouseNR: MCCABE, CRONK
2021-03-20HouseDP: DRUMMOND, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, HOPKINS
2021-03-20HouseTRA RPT CS(TRA) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR
2021-03-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2021-02-18HouseTRA, STA
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback