AK HB62 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Legislative Ethics Act; relating to solemnization of marriage; and relating to consent to marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage: Witnesses/solemnization/consent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading Amend prior motion for all amendments (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 as amended (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 as amended (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 as amended (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 as amended (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-18HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N7
2022-05-18HouseCONCUR TAKEN UP UC
2022-05-18HouseLIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4
2022-05-18HouseCONCUR READ AND HELD
2022-05-17SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 62(JUD)
2022-05-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2022-05-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2022-05-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 62(JUD)
2022-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2022-05-17SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UC
2022-05-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-15SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
2022-05-15SenateAM: KIEHL, SHOWER
2022-05-15SenateNR: HUGHES
2022-05-15SenateDP: HOLLAND, MYERS
2022-05-15SenateJUD RPT SCS(JUD) 2DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
2022-04-27SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS/DOH)
2022-04-27SenateNR: WILSON, REINBOLD, BEGICH, HUGHES
2022-04-27SenateHSS RPT SCS(HSS) 4NR SAME TITLE
2022-03-21SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, GRAY-JACKSON, BEGICH
2022-03-18SenateHSS, JUD
2022-03-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-03-16HouseVERSION: CSHB 62(JUD) AM
2022-03-16HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2022-03-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2022-03-16HousePASSED Y27 N13
2022-03-16HouseMOTION TO RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 WITHDRAWN
2022-03-16HouseAMEND MOTION RETURN TO 2ND FOR ALL AMS FAILED Y11 N29
2022-03-16HouseMOTION TO RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1
2022-03-16HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 62(JUD) AM
2022-03-14HouseHELD TO 3/16 CALENDAR
2022-03-11HouseTECHNICAL SESSION 3/11 - ON 3/14 CALENDAR
2022-03-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, ORTIZ
2022-03-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/11 CALENDAR
2022-03-09House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 9 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 7 NOT OFFERED
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 6 AS AMD FAILED Y17 N19 E4
2022-03-09HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y21 N14 E4 A1
2022-03-09HouseAM 1 TO AM 6 ADOPTED UC
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 6 OFFERED
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y14 N22 E4
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 4 AS AMD FAILED Y15 N21 E4
2022-03-09HouseAM 1 TO AM 4 ADOPTED UC
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 4 OFFERED AND PENDING
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N30 E4
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 1 AS AMD ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4
2022-03-09HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 ADOPTED UC
2022-03-09HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2022-03-09HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2022-03-09HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)(SUBMITTED BY RULES)
2022-03-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-03-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2022
2021-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2021-04-05HouseDNP: EASTMAN, VANCE, KURKA
2021-04-05HouseDP: DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER, CLAMAN
2021-04-05HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 4DP 3DNP
2021-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2021-03-12HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2021-03-12HouseAM: KAUFMAN
2021-03-12HouseDNP: EASTMAN, VANCE
2021-03-12HouseDP: CLAMAN, STORY, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-03-12HouseSTA RPT 4DP 2DNP 1AM
2021-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-02-18HouseSTA, JUD
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB62
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/F/HB0062-1-2-031221-DHS-N.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062E.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0062Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02046#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02047#AM3
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02048#AM4
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02049#AM5
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02051#2051
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02052#AM6
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02052#AM9
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02133#2133
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=02134#2134
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=HB62&Page=02835#2835
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=03075#3075
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB62&Page=03097#3097

Bill Comments

feedback