AK HB56 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to limitations on certain commercial fishing loans made by the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development.
Title
Commercial Fishing Loans
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Sen. Gary Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-09 | Senate | VERSION: HB 56 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N1 E2 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 56 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-05-02 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2018-01-31 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEVENS |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | FIN |
2017-03-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-27 | House | VERSION: HB 56 |
2017-03-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOSEPHSON, MILLETT, KITO, PRUITT |
2017-03-27 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2017-03-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 56 |
2017-03-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-03-17 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, PRUITT, TILTON |
2017-03-17 | House | NR: WILSON, THOMPSON |
2017-03-17 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, GRENN, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-03-17 | House | FIN RPT 5DP 2NR 3AM |
2017-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2017-02-24 | House | NR: EASTMAN, NEUMAN, CHENAULT |
2017-02-24 | House | DP: TARR, FANSLER, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES |
2017-02-24 | House | FSH RPT 4DP 3NR |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-01-18 | House | FSH, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |