AK HB54 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-22 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-22 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Alaska Invasive Species Council in the Department of Fish and Game; relating to management of invasive species; relating to invasive species management decals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Invasive Species Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-04-22 | Senate | FN4: (DFG) |
2022-04-22 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2022-04-22 | Senate | DP: REVAK, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-04-22 | Senate | RES RPT SCS(RES) 6DP SAME TITLE |
2022-02-22 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2022-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-17 | House | VERSION: CSHB 54(FIN) |
2022-02-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-02-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-02-17 | House | PASSED Y33 N2 E5 |
2022-02-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 54(FIN) |
2022-02-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/17 CALENDAR |
2022-02-16 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-02-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-02-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-04 | House | FN4: (DFG) |
2022-02-04 | House | FN3: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2022-02-04 | House | NR: EDGMON, THOMPSON, MERRICK |
2022-02-04 | House | DP: ORTIZ, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, FOSTER |
2022-02-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 3NR |
2021-04-22 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER RES |
2021-04-22 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2021-04-22 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-04-22 | House | NR: MCKAY, HOPKINS, PATKOTAK |
2021-04-22 | House | DNP: GILLHAM, RAUSCHER, CRONK |
2021-04-22 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, HANNAN, FIELDS |
2021-04-22 | House | RES RPT CS(FSH) 3DP 3DNP 3NR |
2021-04-07 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2021-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2021-04-07 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, MCCABE, VANCE, STORY, STUTES, TARR |
2021-04-07 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) 7DP |
2021-03-12 | House | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: FISHERIES REPLACED TARR |
2021-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-02-24 | House | RES REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER FSH |
2021-02-18 | House | RES, FSH |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21 |
Subjects
Agriculture
Alaska Natives
Animals
Appointments
Appropriations
Aviation
Boards & Commissions
Boats & Boating
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Business
Economy
Education
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Funds
Government Organization
Hazardous Substances
Intergovernmental Relations
Marine Facilities
Native Organizations
Railroad
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Resources
Safety
Sanitation
Vessels
Water
Alaska Natives
Animals
Appointments
Appropriations
Aviation
Boards & Commissions
Boats & Boating
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Business
Economy
Education
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Funds
Government Organization
Hazardous Substances
Intergovernmental Relations
Marine Facilities
Native Organizations
Railroad
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Resources
Safety
Sanitation
Vessels
Water