AK HB53 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/17/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/17/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to residency requirements for public school enrollment for certain children of active duty military and National Guard members; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military Children School Residency Waiver
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3.A - Page 1, line 11 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3.A - Page 1, line 11 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/17/22 |
2022-06-17 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 7 SLA 22 |
2022-06-01 | House | 1:00 P.M. 6/1/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-29 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 53(MLV) AM(EFD ADD) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-04-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E2 A2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 53(MLV) AM(EFD ADD) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CAL |
2022-04-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, STEVENS |
2022-02-22 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, HOLLAND |
2022-01-26 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH |
2022-01-26 | Senate | EDC RPT 5DP |
2021-05-14 | Senate | EDC |
2021-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-12 | House | VERSION: CSHB 53(MLV) AM(EFD ADD) |
2021-05-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON |
2021-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-12 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 53(MLV) AM(EFD ADD) |
2021-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-12 | House | AM NO 3B WITHDRAWN |
2021-05-12 | House | AM NO 3A ADOPTED Y23 N15 A2 |
2021-05-12 | House | DIVIDE AM NO 3 UC |
2021-05-12 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED |
2021-05-12 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y39 A1 |
2021-05-12 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-05-12 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-12 | House | MLV CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021 |
2021-05-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-05-03 | House | NR: ZULKOSKY |
2021-05-03 | House | DP: CRONK, GILLHAM, STORY, DRUMMOND |
2021-05-03 | House | EDC RPT CS(MLV) 4DP 1NR |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2021-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2021-03-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-03-10 | House | DP: CLAMAN, TARR, SHAW, STORY, NELSON, TUCK |
2021-03-10 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP |
2021-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER |
2021-02-18 | House | MLV, EDC |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |