AK HB52 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-02 - COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing that operation of the Tutka Bay Lagoon Hatchery in Kachemak Bay is compatible with the functions of Kachemak Bay State Park; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tutka Bay Hatchery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2022-03-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEBON
2022-02-17HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 4DP 4DNP 1NR (CHANGED)
2022-02-17HouseRAUSCHER CHANGED FROM DNP TO DP UC
2022-02-17HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2022-02-17HouseFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2022-02-17HouseNR: PATKOTAK
2022-02-17HouseDNP: FIELDS, SCHRAGE, HANNAN, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS
2022-02-17HouseDP: CRONK, MCKAY, GILLHAM
2022-02-17HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NEW TITLE 3DP 5DNP 1NR
2022-02-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CRONK
2021-05-19HouseFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2021-05-19HouseNR: STORY
2021-05-19HouseDP: VANCE, STUTES, ORTIZ, TARR
2021-05-19HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 4DP 1NR
2021-03-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER
2021-02-18HouseFSH, RES
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback