AK HB52 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to providing a pre-elementary program within a school district; and providing for the certification of early childhood education plans.
Title
Pre-elementary School Programs/plans
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Zach Fansler [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] |
Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY |
2018-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2018-03-28 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-28 | House | FN2: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2018-03-28 | House | DNP: TALERICO, JOHNSTON, KOPP |
2018-03-28 | House | DP: PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND |
2018-03-28 | House | EDC RPT 4DP 3DNP |
2017-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-01-18 | House | EDC, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB52 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0052A.PDF |