AK HB51 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to aggravating factors considered at sentencing.
Title
Aggravating Factors At Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2022-02-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2022-02-04 | House | DNP: EASTMAN, VANCE |
2022-02-04 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2022-02-04 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2DNP |
2021-05-05 | House | STA REFERRAL MOVED TO AFTER JUD |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB51 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0051A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0051B.PDF |