AK HB51 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the regulation of wastewater discharge from small commercial passenger vessels in state waters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Small Vessel Wastewater Exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(DOT) |
2017-02-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(DEC) |
2017-02-03 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, NEUMAN |
2017-02-03 | House | DP: CLAMAN, KOPP, DRUMMOND, STUTES, WOOL |
2017-02-03 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 5DP 2NR |
2017-01-27 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/27/17 |
2017-01-27 | House | PRIME SPONSOR: TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-27 | House | PRIME SPONSOR REMOVED: STUTES |
2017-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ 1/25/17 |
2017-01-20 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/20/17 |
2017-01-20 | House | TRA REPLACES RES REFERRAL |
2017-01-18 | House | RES, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB51 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0051A.PDF |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0051B.PDF |