AK HB5 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: ZULKOSKY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: ZULKOSKY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to sexual abuse of a minor; relating to sexual assault; relating to the code of military justice; relating to consent; relating to the testing of sexual assault examination kits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sexual Assault; Def. Of "consent"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: ZULKOSKY |
2022-05-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2022-05-09 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-09 | House | FN14: (DPS) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN13: (LAW) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN12: (ADM) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN11: (ADM) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN10: INDETERMINATE(AJS) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN9: ZERO(DPS) |
2022-05-09 | House | FN8: ZERO(COR) |
2022-05-09 | House | AM: EASTMAN, VANCE |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2022-05-09 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NEW TITLE 3DP 1NR 2AM |
2022-02-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN |
2021-05-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-05-06 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD |
2021-05-06 | House | FN7: (DPS) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN6: (DPS) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN5: (LAW) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN4: INDETERMINATE(COR) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(AJS) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2021-05-06 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2021-05-06 | House | AM: VANCE, STORY, EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-05-06 | House | DP: TARR |
2021-05-06 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 5AM |
2021-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER |
2021-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-03-26 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-03-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-03-26 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2021-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-03-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |