AK HB49 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/14/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/14/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Certified Direct-Entry Midwives; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Board Of Direct-entry Midwives
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kito [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/14/17 |
2017-05-15 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/13 CHAPTER 7 SLA 17 |
2017-05-12 | House | 11:47 AM 5/11/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N4 E3 |
2017-04-17 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2017-04-17 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 49(L&C) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-04-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 49(L&C) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-16 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2017 |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-15 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(L&C) 7DP |
2017-04-14 | Senate | FIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | NR: STEVENS |
2017-04-13 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER, GARDNER |
2017-04-13 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2017-04-10 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-04-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-07 | House | VERSION: CSHB 49(FIN) |
2017-04-07 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-07 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-07 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 49(FIN) |
2017-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-07 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-07 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-03 | House | DP: GARA, THOMPSON, WILSON, ORTIZ, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-04-03 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP |
2017-02-06 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-02-06 | House | DNP: KNOPP |
2017-02-06 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO |
2017-02-06 | House | L&C RPT 6DP 1DNP |
2017-01-18 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |