AK HB48 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska performance scholarship program.
Title
Ak Performance Scholarship; Eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Grier Hopkins [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-18 | House | FN4: (EED) |
2022-03-18 | House | FN3: (EED) |
2022-03-18 | House | FN2: (EED) |
2022-03-18 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2022-03-18 | House | NR: PRAX, GILLHAM, CRONK |
2022-03-18 | House | DP: HOPKINS, ZULKOSKY, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2022-03-18 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 4DP 3NR |
2022-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-02-22 | House | EDC, FIN |
2022-02-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-02-22 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2022-01-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-02-18 | House | EDC, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |