AK HB48 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the composition of the State Board of Registration for Architects, Engineers, and Land Surveyors; extending the termination date of the State Board of Registration for Architects, Engineers, and Land Surveyors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Architects,engineers,surveyors: Extend Bd
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Steve Thompson [R] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17 |
2017-06-22 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 11 SLA 17 |
2017-06-15 | House | 8:33 AM 6/15/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-13 | Senate | VERSION: HB 48 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-04-13 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-13 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 48 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2017-04-12 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2017-03-29 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, STEVENS, GARDNER |
2017-03-29 | Senate | L&C RPT 5DP |
2017-03-08 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2017-03-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-06 | House | VERSION: HB 48 |
2017-03-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2017-03-06 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-06 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-03-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 48 |
2017-03-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-02-24 | House | SEATON |
2017-02-24 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, |
2017-02-24 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2017-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GARA |
2017-02-13 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-02-13 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, STUTES, KITO |
2017-02-13 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2017-01-18 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |