AK HB47 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act requiring certain municipalities with a population that decreased by more than 25 percent between 2000 and 2010 that participate in the defined benefit retirement plan of the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska to contribute to the system an amount calculated by applying a rate of 22 percent of the total of all base salaries paid by the municipality to employees of the municipality who are active members of the system during a payroll period; authorizing the administrator of the defined benefit retirement plan of the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska to reduce the rate of interest payable by certain municipalities that are delinquent in transmitting employee and employer contributions to the retirement plan; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Pers Contributions/interest

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: HB 47
2018-05-11SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 47
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018
2018-05-07SenateFN4: (ADM)
2018-05-07SenateNR: VON IMHOF
2018-05-07SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON
2018-05-07SenateFIN RPT 5DP 1NR
2018-04-20SenateFN4: (ADM)
2018-04-20SenateDP: COGHILL
2018-04-20SenateNR: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN
2018-04-20SenateSTA RPT 1DP 4NR
2017-05-16SenateSTA, FIN
2017-05-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-15HouseVERSION: HB 47
2017-05-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-05-15HousePASSED Y38 N2
2017-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 47
2017-05-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
2017-05-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2017
2017-04-14HouseFN3: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
2017-04-14HouseFN2: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-14HouseAM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, TILTON, GRENN, PRUITT
2017-04-14HouseDP: ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-14HouseFIN RPT 5DP 6AM
2017-03-03HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2017-03-03HouseAM: SADDLER
2017-03-03HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2017-03-03HouseDP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, PARISH
2017-03-03HouseCRA RPT 4DP 1NR 1AM
2017-01-18HouseCRA, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback